Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0365 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 7, 2022
Fiscal Note February 24, 2022
Fiscal Note February 23, 2022
Fiscal Note February 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 10, 2022
Fiscal Note January 25, 2022
Fiscal Note January 24, 2022
Fiscal Note January 20, 2022
Bill January 10, 2022
Fiscal Note January 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill February 25, 2022

Amended

Bill February 25, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022