Senate | 04/14/2023 | Returned to the House | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Second reading: adopted voice vote | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 23: yeas 95, nays 0 | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Senate sponsor: Senator Alting | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation voice vote | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Karickhoff | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Authored by Representative VanNatter |