Senate | 04/11/2023 | Returned to the House | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Second reading: adopted standing vote | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Senate sponsor: Senator Holdman | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 12: yeas 91, nays 0 | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation voice vote | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Authored by Representative Lehman |