Indiana 2023 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HCR0006 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 *HC1006*
2-April 5, 2023
2+January 17, 2023
33 HOUSE CONCURRENT
44 RESOLUTION No. 6
55 DIGEST OF RESOLUTION
66 A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana
77 Department of Transportation to rename the bridge on U.S.
88 Highway 27 over the Wabash River between Berne and Geneva
99 as the "Spc. Nicholas A. Taylor Memorial Bridge".
1010 Lehman
11-(SENATE SPONSOR — HOLDMAN)
1211 January 12, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation.
1312 January 17, 2023, reported — Do Pass.
14-January 19, 2023, read second time, passed. Yeas 91, nays 0.
15-SENATE ACTION
16-January 24, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Homeland Security and
17-Transportation.
18-April 4, 2023, reported favorably — Do Pass.
19-HC 6—HC 1006/DI 140 April 5, 2023
13+HC 6—HC 1006/DI 140 January 17, 2023
2014 First Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2023)
2115 HOUSE CONCURRENT
2216 RESOLUTION No. 6
2317 1 A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana
2418 2 Department of Transportation to rename the bridge on U.S.
2519 3 Highway 27 over the Wabash River between Berne and Geneva
2620 4 as the "Spc. Nicholas A. Taylor Memorial Bridge".
2721 5 Whereas, Spc. Nicholas "Nick" A. Taylor was born on
2822 6 October 24, 1991, to Tim and Stephania (Montjoy) Taylor of
2923 7 Berne, Indiana;
3024 8 Whereas, Spc. Taylor graduated from South Adams High
3125 9 School, where he was renowned for his leadership and
3226 10 performance in football, track, and wrestling;
3327 11 Whereas, Spc. Taylor was killed in Afghanistan on July 16,
3428 12 2012, while serving with the 81st Troop Command of the
3529 13 Indiana National Guard during Operation Enduring Freedom;
3630 14 Whereas, During a bomb clearing patrol in the Kandahar
3731 15 Province, Spc. Taylor died from injuries sustained from a
3832 16 rocket-propelled grenade; and
3933 17 Whereas, Spc. Taylor was described as a model student who
4034 18 exhibited a positive influence on everyone he was around:
4135 19 Therefore,
4236 20 Be it resolved by the House of Representatives
4337 21 of the General Assembly of the State of Indiana,
4438 22 the Senate concurring:
4539 23 SECTION 1. That the Indiana General Assembly urges the
4640 24 Indiana Department of Transportation to rename the bridge on
4741 HC 6—HC 1006/DI 140 2
4842 1 U.S. Highway 27 over the Wabash River between Berne and
4943 2 Geneva as the "Spc. Nicholas A. Taylor Memorial Bridge".
5044 3 SECTION 2. That the Principal Clerk of the House of
5145 4 Representatives shall transmit copies of this resolution to the
5246 5 Commissioner of the Indiana Department of Transportation.
5347 HC 6—HC 1006/DI 140 3
5448 COMMITTEE REPORT
5549 Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Roads and Transportation, to
5650 which was referred House Concurrent Resolution 6, has had the same
5751 under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
5852 House with the recommendation that said resolution do pass.
5953 (Reference is to HC 6 as printed January 12, 2023.)
6054 PRESSEL
6155 Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0
62-_____
63-COMMITTEE REPORT
64-Madam President: The Senate Committee on Homeland Security
65-and Transportation, to which was referred House Concurrent
66-Resolution No. 6, has had the same under consideration and begs leave
67-to report the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that
68-said resolution DO PASS.
69- (Reference is to HC 6 as printed January 17, 2023.)
70-
71-CRIDER, Chairperson
72-Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0
7356 HC 6—HC 1006/DI 140