Indiana 2023 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HCR0006 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/04/2023

                            *HC1006*
April 5, 2023
HOUSE CONCURRENT
RESOLUTION No. 6
DIGEST OF RESOLUTION
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana
Department of Transportation to rename the bridge on U.S.
Highway 27 over the Wabash River between Berne and Geneva
as the "Spc. Nicholas A. Taylor Memorial Bridge".
Lehman
(SENATE SPONSOR — HOLDMAN)
January 12, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation.
January 17, 2023, reported — Do Pass.
January 19, 2023, read second time, passed. Yeas 91, nays 0.
SENATE ACTION
January 24, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Homeland Security and
Transportation.
April 4, 2023, reported favorably — Do Pass.
HC 6—HC 1006/DI 140  April 5, 2023
First Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2023)
HOUSE CONCURRENT
RESOLUTION No. 6
1 A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana
2 Department of Transportation to rename the bridge on U.S.
3 Highway 27 over the Wabash River between Berne and Geneva
4 as the "Spc. Nicholas A. Taylor Memorial Bridge".
5 Whereas, Spc. Nicholas "Nick" A. Taylor was born on
6 October 24, 1991, to Tim and Stephania (Montjoy) Taylor of
7 Berne, Indiana; 
8 Whereas, Spc. Taylor graduated from South Adams High
9 School, where he was renowned for his leadership and
10 performance in football, track, and wrestling; 
11 Whereas, Spc. Taylor was killed in Afghanistan on July 16,
12 2012, while serving with the 81st Troop Command of the
13 Indiana National Guard during Operation Enduring Freedom; 
14 Whereas, During a bomb clearing patrol in the Kandahar
15 Province, Spc. Taylor died from injuries sustained from a
16 rocket-propelled grenade; and
17 Whereas, Spc. Taylor was described as a model student who
18 exhibited a positive influence on everyone he was around:
19 Therefore,
20 Be it resolved by the House of Representatives
21 of the General Assembly of the State of Indiana,
22 the Senate concurring:
23 SECTION 1. That the Indiana General Assembly urges the
24 Indiana Department of Transportation to rename the bridge on
HC 6—HC 1006/DI 140 2
1 U.S. Highway 27 over the Wabash River between Berne and
2 Geneva as the "Spc. Nicholas A. Taylor Memorial Bridge".
3 SECTION 2. That the Principal Clerk of the House of
4 Representatives shall transmit copies of this resolution to the
5 Commissioner of the Indiana Department of Transportation.
HC 6—HC 1006/DI 140 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Roads and Transportation, to
which was referred House Concurrent Resolution 6, has had the same
under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
House with the recommendation that said resolution do pass. 
(Reference is to HC 6 as printed January 12, 2023.) 
PRESSEL
Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0         
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Homeland Security
and Transportation, to which was referred House Concurrent
Resolution No. 6, has had the same under consideration and begs leave
to report the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that
said resolution DO PASS.
 (Reference is to HC 6 as printed January 17, 2023.)
           
CRIDER, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0
HC 6—HC 1006/DI 140