House | 02/07/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Senators Becker, Buck, Ford J.D. added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Senator Glick added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Senator Crider added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Cosponsors: Representatives Manning and Negele | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | House sponsor: Representative Soliday | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 11: yeas 48, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | Authored by Senator Leising |