House
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 45
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 187: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senator Walker G added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Donato
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 29: yeas 96, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Representative Clere added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Representative Pack R added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Representative Goss-Reaves added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Representative DeVon
|
|
|