Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1051 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 28, 2024
Fiscal Note February 26, 2024
Fiscal Note February 22, 2024
Fiscal Note February 19, 2024
Fiscal Note January 23, 2024
Fiscal Note January 22, 2024
Fiscal Note January 18, 2024
Bill January 4, 2024
Fiscal Note January 4, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 19, 2024
Bill January 18, 2024