| 1 | + | *EH1051.1* |
---|
| 2 | + | February 20, 2024 |
---|
| 3 | + | ENGROSSED |
---|
| 4 | + | HOUSE BILL No. 1051 |
---|
| 5 | + | _____ |
---|
| 6 | + | DIGEST OF HB 1051 (Updated February 19, 2024 10:23 am - DI 119) |
---|
| 7 | + | Citations Affected: IC 31-10. |
---|
| 8 | + | Synopsis: Communication between caregivers and parents. Provides |
---|
| 9 | + | that supporting and facilitating two-way communication between |
---|
| 10 | + | parents and foster parents or kinship caregivers is a state policy. |
---|
| 11 | + | Effective: July 1, 2024. |
---|
| 12 | + | DeVon, Goss-Reaves, Pack, Clere |
---|
| 13 | + | (SENATE SPONSOR — DONATO) |
---|
| 14 | + | January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human |
---|
| 15 | + | Affairs. |
---|
| 16 | + | January 18, 2024, reported — Do Pass. |
---|
| 17 | + | January 22, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed. |
---|
| 18 | + | January 23, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 96, nays 0. |
---|
| 19 | + | SENATE ACTION |
---|
| 20 | + | February 5, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Family and Children |
---|
| 21 | + | Services. |
---|
| 22 | + | February 19, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass. |
---|
| 23 | + | EH 1051—LS 6449/DI 148 February 20, 2024 |
---|
15 | | - | SECTION 1. IC 31-10-2-1, AS AMENDED BY P.L.146-2021, |
---|
16 | | - | SECTION 4, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE |
---|
17 | | - | JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 1. It is the policy of this state and the purpose of |
---|
18 | | - | this title to: |
---|
19 | | - | (1) recognize the importance of family and children in our society, |
---|
20 | | - | including the parenting rights of a parent, regardless of whether |
---|
21 | | - | the parent has a disability; |
---|
22 | | - | (2) recognize the responsibility of the state to enhance the |
---|
23 | | - | viability of children and family in our society; |
---|
24 | | - | (3) acknowledge the responsibility each person owes to the other; |
---|
25 | | - | (4) strengthen family life by assisting parents to fulfill their |
---|
26 | | - | parental obligations; |
---|
27 | | - | (5) ensure that children within the juvenile justice system are |
---|
28 | | - | treated as persons in need of care, protection, treatment, and |
---|
29 | | - | rehabilitation; |
---|
30 | | - | (6) remove children from families only when it is in the child's |
---|
31 | | - | best interest or in the best interest of public safety; |
---|
32 | | - | (7) make reasonable efforts to support and facilitate two-way |
---|
33 | | - | communication between a child's parent or parents and any |
---|
34 | | - | licensed foster parent or kinship caregiver caring for the child |
---|
35 | | - | following removal by the department of child services; |
---|
36 | | - | HEA 1051 2 |
---|
37 | | - | (7) (8) provide for adoption as a viable permanency plan for |
---|
38 | | - | children who are adjudicated children in need of services; |
---|
39 | | - | (8) (9) provide a juvenile justice system that protects the public |
---|
40 | | - | by enforcing the legal obligations that children have to society |
---|
41 | | - | and society has to children; |
---|
42 | | - | (9) (10) use diversionary programs when appropriate; |
---|
43 | | - | (10) (11) provide a judicial procedure that: |
---|
44 | | - | (A) ensures fair hearings; |
---|
45 | | - | (B) recognizes and enforces the legal rights of children and |
---|
46 | | - | their parents; and |
---|
47 | | - | (C) recognizes and enforces the accountability of children and |
---|
48 | | - | parents; |
---|
49 | | - | (11) (12) promote public safety and individual accountability by |
---|
50 | | - | the imposition of appropriate sanctions; and |
---|
51 | | - | (12) (13) provide a continuum of services developed in a |
---|
52 | | - | cooperative effort by local governments and the state. |
---|
53 | | - | HEA 1051 Speaker of the House of Representatives |
---|
54 | | - | President of the Senate |
---|
55 | | - | President Pro Tempore |
---|
56 | | - | Governor of the State of Indiana |
---|
57 | | - | Date: Time: |
---|
58 | | - | HEA 1051 |
---|
| 39 | + | 1 SECTION 1. IC 31-10-2-1, AS AMENDED BY P.L.146-2021, |
---|
| 40 | + | 2 SECTION 4, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE |
---|
| 41 | + | 3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 1. It is the policy of this state and the purpose of |
---|
| 42 | + | 4 this title to: |
---|
| 43 | + | 5 (1) recognize the importance of family and children in our society, |
---|
| 44 | + | 6 including the parenting rights of a parent, regardless of whether |
---|
| 45 | + | 7 the parent has a disability; |
---|
| 46 | + | 8 (2) recognize the responsibility of the state to enhance the |
---|
| 47 | + | 9 viability of children and family in our society; |
---|
| 48 | + | 10 (3) acknowledge the responsibility each person owes to the other; |
---|
| 49 | + | 11 (4) strengthen family life by assisting parents to fulfill their |
---|
| 50 | + | 12 parental obligations; |
---|
| 51 | + | 13 (5) ensure that children within the juvenile justice system are |
---|
| 52 | + | 14 treated as persons in need of care, protection, treatment, and |
---|
| 53 | + | 15 rehabilitation; |
---|
| 54 | + | 16 (6) remove children from families only when it is in the child's |
---|
| 55 | + | 17 best interest or in the best interest of public safety; |
---|
| 56 | + | EH 1051—LS 6449/DI 148 2 |
---|
| 57 | + | 1 (7) make reasonable efforts to support and facilitate two-way |
---|
| 58 | + | 2 communication between a child's parent or parents and any |
---|
| 59 | + | 3 licensed foster parent or kinship caregiver caring for the child |
---|
| 60 | + | 4 following removal by the department of child services; |
---|
| 61 | + | 5 (7) (8) provide for adoption as a viable permanency plan for |
---|
| 62 | + | 6 children who are adjudicated children in need of services; |
---|
| 63 | + | 7 (8) (9) provide a juvenile justice system that protects the public |
---|
| 64 | + | 8 by enforcing the legal obligations that children have to society |
---|
| 65 | + | 9 and society has to children; |
---|
| 66 | + | 10 (9) (10) use diversionary programs when appropriate; |
---|
| 67 | + | 11 (10) (11) provide a judicial procedure that: |
---|
| 68 | + | 12 (A) ensures fair hearings; |
---|
| 69 | + | 13 (B) recognizes and enforces the legal rights of children and |
---|
| 70 | + | 14 their parents; and |
---|
| 71 | + | 15 (C) recognizes and enforces the accountability of children and |
---|
| 72 | + | 16 parents; |
---|
| 73 | + | 17 (11) (12) promote public safety and individual accountability by |
---|
| 74 | + | 18 the imposition of appropriate sanctions; and |
---|
| 75 | + | 19 (12) (13) provide a continuum of services developed in a |
---|
| 76 | + | 20 cooperative effort by local governments and the state. |
---|
| 77 | + | EH 1051—LS 6449/DI 148 3 |
---|
| 78 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 79 | + | Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Family, Children and Human |
---|
| 80 | + | Affairs, to which was referred House Bill 1051, has had the same under |
---|
| 81 | + | consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with |
---|
| 82 | + | the recommendation that said bill do pass. |
---|
| 83 | + | (Reference is to HB 1051 as introduced.) |
---|
| 84 | + | DEVON |
---|
| 85 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0 |
---|
| 86 | + | _____ |
---|
| 87 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 88 | + | Madam President: The Senate Committee on Family and Children |
---|
| 89 | + | Services, to which was referred House Bill No. 1051, has had the same |
---|
| 90 | + | under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the |
---|
| 91 | + | Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS. |
---|
| 92 | + | (Reference is to HB 1051 as printed January 18, 2024.) |
---|
| 93 | + | |
---|
| 94 | + | WALKER G, Chairperson |
---|
| 95 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0 |
---|
| 96 | + | EH 1051—LS 6449/DI 148 |
---|