Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1051 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/19/2024

                    *EH1051.1*
February 20, 2024
ENGROSSED
HOUSE BILL No. 1051
_____
DIGEST OF HB 1051 (Updated February 19, 2024 10:23 am - DI 119)
Citations Affected:  IC 31-10.
Synopsis:  Communication between caregivers and parents. Provides
that supporting and facilitating two-way communication between
parents and foster parents or kinship caregivers is a state policy.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
DeVon, Goss-Reaves, Pack, Clere
(SENATE SPONSOR — DONATO)
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human
Affairs.
January 18, 2024, reported — Do Pass.
January 22, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed.
January 23, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 96, nays 0.
SENATE ACTION
February 5, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Family and Children
Services.
February 19, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass.
EH 1051—LS 6449/DI 148  February 20, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
ENGROSSED
HOUSE BILL No. 1051
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
family law and juvenile law.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 31-10-2-1, AS AMENDED BY P.L.146-2021,
2 SECTION 4, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 1. It is the policy of this state and the purpose of
4 this title to:
5 (1) recognize the importance of family and children in our society,
6 including the parenting rights of a parent, regardless of whether
7 the parent has a disability;
8 (2) recognize the responsibility of the state to enhance the
9 viability of children and family in our society;
10 (3) acknowledge the responsibility each person owes to the other;
11 (4) strengthen family life by assisting parents to fulfill their
12 parental obligations;
13 (5) ensure that children within the juvenile justice system are
14 treated as persons in need of care, protection, treatment, and
15 rehabilitation;
16 (6) remove children from families only when it is in the child's
17 best interest or in the best interest of public safety;
EH 1051—LS 6449/DI 148 2
1 (7) make reasonable efforts to support and facilitate two-way
2 communication between a child's parent or parents and any
3 licensed foster parent or kinship caregiver caring for the child
4 following removal by the department of child services;
5 (7) (8) provide for adoption as a viable permanency plan for
6 children who are adjudicated children in need of services;
7 (8) (9) provide a juvenile justice system that protects the public
8 by enforcing the legal obligations that children have to society
9 and society has to children;
10 (9) (10) use diversionary programs when appropriate;
11 (10) (11) provide a judicial procedure that:
12 (A) ensures fair hearings;
13 (B) recognizes and enforces the legal rights of children and
14 their parents; and
15 (C) recognizes and enforces the accountability of children and
16 parents;
17 (11) (12) promote public safety and individual accountability by
18 the imposition of appropriate sanctions; and
19 (12) (13) provide a continuum of services developed in a
20 cooperative effort by local governments and the state.
EH 1051—LS 6449/DI 148 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Family, Children and Human
Affairs, to which was referred House Bill 1051, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with
the recommendation that said bill do pass. 
(Reference is to HB 1051 as introduced.) 
DEVON
Committee Vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Family and Children
Services, to which was referred House Bill No. 1051, has had the same
under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS.
 (Reference is to HB 1051 as printed January 18, 2024.)
           
WALKER G, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0
EH 1051—LS 6449/DI 148