Senate | 02/05/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 62: yeas 97, nays 0 | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Senate sponsors: Senators Johnson T, Walker G, Walker K | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Representative Cash B added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Authored by Representative Greene |