Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1156 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 01/23/2024

                            *HB1156.1*
January 23, 2024
HOUSE BILL No. 1156
_____
DIGEST OF HB 1156 (Updated January 23, 2024 11:36 am - DI 147)
Citations Affected:  Noncode.
Synopsis:  Report on Medicaid behavior analysis services. Requires
the office of the secretary of family and social services to prepare and
submit a report to specified entities concerning data on the provision
of applied behavior analysis services in the Medicaid program. 
Effective:  Upon passage.
Greene, Cash
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Public Health.
January 23, 2024, amended, reported — Do Pass.
HB 1156—LS 6640/DI 104  January 23, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1156
A BILL FOR AN ACT concerning human services.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. [EFFECTIVE UPON PASSAGE] (a) Before
2 November 1, 2024, the office of the secretary of family and social
3 services shall prepare and submit under subsection (b) a report for
4 the period beginning January 1, 2023, and ending October 1, 2024,
5 setting forth the impact of Medicaid reimbursement changes to the
6 applied behavior analysis services. The report must include the
7 following:
8 (1) A summary of the changes that were made to Medicaid
9 reimbursement rates for applied behavior analysis services.
10 (2) The number of claims for Medicaid recipients per month
11 for applied behavior analysis services throughout the
12 reporting period.
13 (3) The number of Medicaid recipients per month who are
14 authorized to receive applied behavior analysis services.
15 (4) The number of Medicaid applied behavior analysis
16 therapists (as identified by provider type code 11 and
17 provider specialty code 615) per month during the reporting
18 period and whether this number decreased during the
HB 1156—LS 6640/DI 104 2
1 reporting period. This subdivision includes applied behavior
2 analysis therapists that were billing for applied behavior
3 analysis services before January 1, 2024, and have not
4 submitted a claim to Medicaid for reimbursement for those
5 services.
6 (5) The average number of claims per month per provider for
7 applied behavior analysis services provided to Medicaid
8 recipients.
9 (6) The number of providers per month that submitted claims
10 for applied behavior analysis services for Medicaid recipients
11 during the reporting period.
12 (7) The number of Medicaid recipients per month who had
13 claims submitted for receiving applied behavior analysis
14 services during the reporting period.
15 (b) The office of the secretary of family and social services shall
16 submit a copy of the report required by subsection (a) to the
17 following:
18 (1) The Medicaid oversight committee, in an electronic format
19 under IC 5-14-6.
20 (2) The legislative council, in an electronic format under
21 IC 5-14-6.
22 (3) The Medicaid advisory committee created by
23 IC 12-15-33-2.
24 (4) The services for individuals with intellectual and other
25 developmental disabilities task force established by
26 IC 12-11-15.5-2.
27 (c) This SECTION expires December 31, 2025.
28 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act.
HB 1156—LS 6640/DI 104 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Public Health, to which was
referred House Bill 1156, has had the same under consideration and
begs leave to report the same back to the House with the
recommendation that said bill be amended as follows:
Page 1, line 15, delete "providers per month that are" and insert
"applied behavior analysis therapists (as identified by provider
type code 11 and provider specialty code 615) per month".
Page 1, delete line 16.
 Page 1, line 17, delete "analysis services".
Page 2, line 1, delete "providers" and insert "applied behavior
analysis therapists".
and when so amended that said bill do pass.
(Reference is to HB 1156 as introduced.)
BARRETT
Committee Vote: yeas 11, nays 0.
HB 1156—LS 6640/DI 104