16 | 15 | | Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024) |
---|
17 | 16 | | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana |
---|
18 | 17 | | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, |
---|
19 | 18 | | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. |
---|
20 | 19 | | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional |
---|
21 | 20 | | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the |
---|
22 | 21 | | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds |
---|
23 | 22 | | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. |
---|
24 | 23 | | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts |
---|
25 | 24 | | between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. |
---|
26 | 25 | | HOUSE BILL No. 1156 |
---|
27 | 26 | | A BILL FOR AN ACT concerning human services. |
---|
28 | 27 | | Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: |
---|
29 | 28 | | 1 SECTION 1. [EFFECTIVE UPON PASSAGE] (a) Before |
---|
30 | 29 | | 2 November 1, 2024, the office of the secretary of family and social |
---|
31 | 30 | | 3 services shall prepare and submit under subsection (b) a report for |
---|
32 | 31 | | 4 the period beginning January 1, 2023, and ending October 1, 2024, |
---|
33 | 32 | | 5 setting forth the impact of Medicaid reimbursement changes to the |
---|
34 | 33 | | 6 applied behavior analysis services. The report must include the |
---|
35 | 34 | | 7 following: |
---|
36 | 35 | | 8 (1) A summary of the changes that were made to Medicaid |
---|
37 | 36 | | 9 reimbursement rates for applied behavior analysis services. |
---|
38 | 37 | | 10 (2) The number of claims for Medicaid recipients per month |
---|
39 | 38 | | 11 for applied behavior analysis services throughout the |
---|
40 | 39 | | 12 reporting period. |
---|
41 | 40 | | 13 (3) The number of Medicaid recipients per month who are |
---|
42 | 41 | | 14 authorized to receive applied behavior analysis services. |
---|
43 | | - | 15 (4) The number of Medicaid applied behavior analysis |
---|
44 | | - | 16 therapists (as identified by provider type code 11 and |
---|
45 | | - | 17 provider specialty code 615) per month during the reporting |
---|
46 | | - | 18 period and whether this number decreased during the |
---|
47 | | - | HB 1156—LS 6640/DI 104 2 |
---|
48 | | - | 1 reporting period. This subdivision includes applied behavior |
---|
49 | | - | 2 analysis therapists that were billing for applied behavior |
---|
50 | | - | 3 analysis services before January 1, 2024, and have not |
---|
51 | | - | 4 submitted a claim to Medicaid for reimbursement for those |
---|
52 | | - | 5 services. |
---|
53 | | - | 6 (5) The average number of claims per month per provider for |
---|
54 | | - | 7 applied behavior analysis services provided to Medicaid |
---|
55 | | - | 8 recipients. |
---|
56 | | - | 9 (6) The number of providers per month that submitted claims |
---|
57 | | - | 10 for applied behavior analysis services for Medicaid recipients |
---|
58 | | - | 11 during the reporting period. |
---|
59 | | - | 12 (7) The number of Medicaid recipients per month who had |
---|
60 | | - | 13 claims submitted for receiving applied behavior analysis |
---|
61 | | - | 14 services during the reporting period. |
---|
62 | | - | 15 (b) The office of the secretary of family and social services shall |
---|
63 | | - | 16 submit a copy of the report required by subsection (a) to the |
---|
64 | | - | 17 following: |
---|
65 | | - | 18 (1) The Medicaid oversight committee, in an electronic format |
---|
66 | | - | 19 under IC 5-14-6. |
---|
67 | | - | 20 (2) The legislative council, in an electronic format under |
---|
68 | | - | 21 IC 5-14-6. |
---|
69 | | - | 22 (3) The Medicaid advisory committee created by |
---|
70 | | - | 23 IC 12-15-33-2. |
---|
71 | | - | 24 (4) The services for individuals with intellectual and other |
---|
72 | | - | 25 developmental disabilities task force established by |
---|
73 | | - | 26 IC 12-11-15.5-2. |
---|
74 | | - | 27 (c) This SECTION expires December 31, 2025. |
---|
75 | | - | 28 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act. |
---|
76 | | - | HB 1156—LS 6640/DI 104 3 |
---|
77 | | - | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
78 | | - | Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Public Health, to which was |
---|
79 | | - | referred House Bill 1156, has had the same under consideration and |
---|
80 | | - | begs leave to report the same back to the House with the |
---|
81 | | - | recommendation that said bill be amended as follows: |
---|
82 | | - | Page 1, line 15, delete "providers per month that are" and insert |
---|
83 | | - | "applied behavior analysis therapists (as identified by provider |
---|
84 | | - | type code 11 and provider specialty code 615) per month". |
---|
85 | | - | Page 1, delete line 16. |
---|
86 | | - | Page 1, line 17, delete "analysis services". |
---|
87 | | - | Page 2, line 1, delete "providers" and insert "applied behavior |
---|
88 | | - | analysis therapists". |
---|
89 | | - | and when so amended that said bill do pass. |
---|
90 | | - | (Reference is to HB 1156 as introduced.) |
---|
91 | | - | BARRETT |
---|
92 | | - | Committee Vote: yeas 11, nays 0. |
---|
93 | | - | HB 1156—LS 6640/DI 104 |
---|
| 42 | + | 15 (4) The number of Medicaid providers per month that are |
---|
| 43 | + | 16 approved under Medicaid to provide applied behavior |
---|
| 44 | + | 17 analysis services during the reporting period and whether this |
---|
| 45 | + | 18 number decreased during the reporting period. This |
---|
| 46 | + | 2024 IN 1156—LS 6640/DI 104 2 |
---|
| 47 | + | 1 subdivision includes providers that were billing for applied |
---|
| 48 | + | 2 behavior analysis services before January 1, 2024, and have |
---|
| 49 | + | 3 not submitted a claim to Medicaid for reimbursement for |
---|
| 50 | + | 4 those services. |
---|
| 51 | + | 5 (5) The average number of claims per month per provider for |
---|
| 52 | + | 6 applied behavior analysis services provided to Medicaid |
---|
| 53 | + | 7 recipients. |
---|
| 54 | + | 8 (6) The number of providers per month that submitted claims |
---|
| 55 | + | 9 for applied behavior analysis services for Medicaid recipients |
---|
| 56 | + | 10 during the reporting period. |
---|
| 57 | + | 11 (7) The number of Medicaid recipients per month who had |
---|
| 58 | + | 12 claims submitted for receiving applied behavior analysis |
---|
| 59 | + | 13 services during the reporting period. |
---|
| 60 | + | 14 (b) The office of the secretary of family and social services shall |
---|
| 61 | + | 15 submit a copy of the report required by subsection (a) to the |
---|
| 62 | + | 16 following: |
---|
| 63 | + | 17 (1) The Medicaid oversight committee, in an electronic format |
---|
| 64 | + | 18 under IC 5-14-6. |
---|
| 65 | + | 19 (2) The legislative council, in an electronic format under |
---|
| 66 | + | 20 IC 5-14-6. |
---|
| 67 | + | 21 (3) The Medicaid advisory committee created by |
---|
| 68 | + | 22 IC 12-15-33-2. |
---|
| 69 | + | 23 (4) The services for individuals with intellectual and other |
---|
| 70 | + | 24 developmental disabilities task force established by |
---|
| 71 | + | 25 IC 12-11-15.5-2. |
---|
| 72 | + | 26 (c) This SECTION expires December 31, 2025. |
---|
| 73 | + | 27 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act. |
---|
| 74 | + | 2024 IN 1156—LS 6640/DI 104 |
---|