Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1156 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/04/2024

                     
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1156
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  Noncode.
Synopsis:  Report on Medicaid behavior analysis services. Requires
the office of the secretary of family and social services to prepare and
submit a report to specified entities concerning data on the provision
of applied behavior analysis services in the Medicaid program. 
Effective:  Upon passage.
Greene
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Public Health.
2024	IN 1156—LS 6640/DI 104 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1156
A BILL FOR AN ACT concerning human services.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. [EFFECTIVE UPON PASSAGE] (a) Before
2 November 1, 2024, the office of the secretary of family and social
3 services shall prepare and submit under subsection (b) a report for
4 the period beginning January 1, 2023, and ending October 1, 2024,
5 setting forth the impact of Medicaid reimbursement changes to the
6 applied behavior analysis services. The report must include the
7 following:
8 (1) A summary of the changes that were made to Medicaid
9 reimbursement rates for applied behavior analysis services.
10 (2) The number of claims for Medicaid recipients per month
11 for applied behavior analysis services throughout the
12 reporting period.
13 (3) The number of Medicaid recipients per month who are
14 authorized to receive applied behavior analysis services.
15 (4) The number of Medicaid providers per month that are
16 approved under Medicaid to provide applied behavior
17 analysis services during the reporting period and whether this
18 number decreased during the reporting period. This
2024	IN 1156—LS 6640/DI 104 2
1 subdivision includes providers that were billing for applied
2 behavior analysis services before January 1, 2024, and have
3 not submitted a claim to Medicaid for reimbursement for
4 those services.
5 (5) The average number of claims per month per provider for
6 applied behavior analysis services provided to Medicaid
7 recipients.
8 (6) The number of providers per month that submitted claims
9 for applied behavior analysis services for Medicaid recipients
10 during the reporting period.
11 (7) The number of Medicaid recipients per month who had
12 claims submitted for receiving applied behavior analysis
13 services during the reporting period.
14 (b) The office of the secretary of family and social services shall
15 submit a copy of the report required by subsection (a) to the
16 following:
17 (1) The Medicaid oversight committee, in an electronic format
18 under IC 5-14-6.
19 (2) The legislative council, in an electronic format under
20 IC 5-14-6.
21 (3) The Medicaid advisory committee created by
22 IC 12-15-33-2.
23 (4) The services for individuals with intellectual and other
24 developmental disabilities task force established by
25 IC 12-11-15.5-2.
26 (c) This SECTION expires December 31, 2025.
27 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act.
2024	IN 1156—LS 6640/DI 104