Senate | 02/12/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Senate sponsor: Senator Zay | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 93, nays 1 | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Representative Porter added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Representative Barrett added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Authored by Representative Zent | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Patterson |