Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1214 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 31, 2024
Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Fiscal Note January 25, 2024
Fiscal Note January 16, 2024
Bill January 8, 2024
Fiscal Note January 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 25, 2024
Bill January 16, 2024