House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 147
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 299: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 280: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Johnson T, Charbonneau, Brown L
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Representative Steuerwald
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Coauthored by Representatives McNamara, Jeter, Moseley
|
|
|