Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1216 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 6, 2024
Fiscal Note March 5, 2024
Fiscal Note March 4, 2024
Fiscal Note February 29, 2024
Fiscal Note February 15, 2024
Fiscal Note January 22, 2024
Fiscal Note January 18, 2024
Fiscal Note January 16, 2024
Bill January 8, 2024
Fiscal Note January 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 29, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 16, 2024