House | 03/04/2024 | Representative Barrett added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Returned to the House | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Second reading: adopted voice vote | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 9: yeas 93, nays 0 | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Senate sponsors: Senators Alexander and Raatz | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Criswell | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Authored by Representative Prescott |