Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HCR0003 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 02/27/2024

                            *HC1004*
February 28, 2024
HOUSE CONCURRENT
RESOLUTION No. 3
DIGEST OF RESOLUTION
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana
Department of Transportation to rename that portion of State
Road 32 from County Road 900 West to State Road 1 the "Kyle
Osgood Memorial Mile".
Prescott, Criswell
(SENATE SPONSORS — ALEXANDER, RAATZ)
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation.
January 9, 2024, reported — Do Pass.
January 16, 2024, read second time, passed. Yeas 93, nays 0.
SENATE ACTION
January 18, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Homeland Security and
Transportation.
February 27, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass.
HC 3—HC 1004/DI 140  February 28, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
HOUSE CONCURRENT
RESOLUTION No. 3
1 A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana
2 Department of Transportation to rename that portion of State
3 Road 32 from County Road 900 West to State Road 1 the "Kyle
4 Osgood Memorial Mile".
5 Whereas, Assistant Chief Kyle Osgood was a member of the
6 Farmland Volunteer Fire Department in Farmland, Indiana,
7 for 15 years; 
8 Whereas, Kyle died in the line of duty while responding to a
9 barn fire in Randolph County on Thursday, May 25th, 2023; 
10 Whereas, Kyle followed in his father's footsteps by
11 volunteering with the department, where he was a fixture since
12 childhood; 
13 Whereas, He is survived by his wife, his young son, his
14 parents, his siblings, and many family and friends; 
15 Whereas, Kyle was known for his wit and warm personality
16 and the effort he put into raising his son Tyler; and
17 Whereas, Kyle's dedication and service to the Farmland
18 community will deeply missed: Therefore,
19 Be it resolved by the House of Representatives
20 of the General Assembly of the State of Indiana,
21 the Senate concurring:
22 SECTION 1. That the Indiana General Assembly urges the
23 Indiana Department of Transportation to rename that portion of
HC 3—HC 1004/DI 140 2
1 State Road 32 from County Road 900 West to State Road 1 the
2 "Kyle Osgood Memorial Mile".
3 SECTION 2. That the Principal Clerk of the House of
4 Representatives shall transmit copies of this resolution to the
5 Commissioner of the Indiana Department of Transportation.
HC 3—HC 1004/DI 140 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Roads and Transportation, to
which was referred House Concurrent Resolution 3, has had the same
under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
House with the recommendation that said resolution do pass. 
(Reference is to HC 3 as printed January 8, 2024.) 
PRESSEL
Committee Vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0         
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Homeland Security
and Transportation, to which was referred House Concurrent
Resolution No. 3, has had the same under consideration and begs leave
to report the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that
said resolution DO PASS.
 (Reference is to HC 3 as printed January 9, 2024.)
           
CRIDER, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0
HC 3—HC 1004/DI 140