Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HCR0003 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 *HC1004*
2-February 28, 2024
2+January 9, 2024
33 HOUSE CONCURRENT
44 RESOLUTION No. 3
55 DIGEST OF RESOLUTION
66 A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana
77 Department of Transportation to rename that portion of State
88 Road 32 from County Road 900 West to State Road 1 the "Kyle
99 Osgood Memorial Mile".
1010 Prescott, Criswell
11-(SENATE SPONSORS — ALEXANDER, RAATZ)
1211 January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation.
1312 January 9, 2024, reported — Do Pass.
14-January 16, 2024, read second time, passed. Yeas 93, nays 0.
15-SENATE ACTION
16-January 18, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Homeland Security and
17-Transportation.
18-February 27, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass.
19-HC 3—HC 1004/DI 140 February 28, 2024
13+HC 3—HC 1004/DI 140 January 9, 2024
2014 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
2115 HOUSE CONCURRENT
2216 RESOLUTION No. 3
2317 1 A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana
2418 2 Department of Transportation to rename that portion of State
2519 3 Road 32 from County Road 900 West to State Road 1 the "Kyle
2620 4 Osgood Memorial Mile".
2721 5 Whereas, Assistant Chief Kyle Osgood was a member of the
2822 6 Farmland Volunteer Fire Department in Farmland, Indiana,
2923 7 for 15 years;
3024 8 Whereas, Kyle died in the line of duty while responding to a
3125 9 barn fire in Randolph County on Thursday, May 25th, 2023;
3226 10 Whereas, Kyle followed in his father's footsteps by
3327 11 volunteering with the department, where he was a fixture since
3428 12 childhood;
3529 13 Whereas, He is survived by his wife, his young son, his
3630 14 parents, his siblings, and many family and friends;
3731 15 Whereas, Kyle was known for his wit and warm personality
3832 16 and the effort he put into raising his son Tyler; and
3933 17 Whereas, Kyle's dedication and service to the Farmland
4034 18 community will deeply missed: Therefore,
4135 19 Be it resolved by the House of Representatives
4236 20 of the General Assembly of the State of Indiana,
4337 21 the Senate concurring:
4438 22 SECTION 1. That the Indiana General Assembly urges the
4539 23 Indiana Department of Transportation to rename that portion of
4640 HC 3—HC 1004/DI 140 2
4741 1 State Road 32 from County Road 900 West to State Road 1 the
4842 2 "Kyle Osgood Memorial Mile".
4943 3 SECTION 2. That the Principal Clerk of the House of
5044 4 Representatives shall transmit copies of this resolution to the
5145 5 Commissioner of the Indiana Department of Transportation.
5246 HC 3—HC 1004/DI 140 3
5347 COMMITTEE REPORT
5448 Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Roads and Transportation, to
5549 which was referred House Concurrent Resolution 3, has had the same
5650 under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
5751 House with the recommendation that said resolution do pass.
5852 (Reference is to HC 3 as printed January 8, 2024.)
5953 PRESSEL
6054 Committee Vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0
61-_____
62-COMMITTEE REPORT
63-Madam President: The Senate Committee on Homeland Security
64-and Transportation, to which was referred House Concurrent
65-Resolution No. 3, has had the same under consideration and begs leave
66-to report the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that
67-said resolution DO PASS.
68- (Reference is to HC 3 as printed January 9, 2024.)
69-
70-CRIDER, Chairperson
71-Committee Vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0
7255 HC 3—HC 1004/DI 140