Senate | 02/28/2024 | Returned to the House | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senators Yoder, Vinzant, Taylor G, Randolph, Pol, Niezgodski, Hunley, Ford J.D. added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senators Dernulc, Raatz, Alexander, Bassler, Gaskill added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senators Crider, Donato, Busch, Koch, Walker K added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senators Alting, Doriot, Tomes, Bohacek, Becker added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | First reading: adopted voice vote | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | First reading: adopted | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Coauthored by Representatives Johnson B, Moseley, DeLaney, Pierce M, Bauer M, Speedy, GiaQuinta, Campbell, Abbott, Goodrich, Pfaff, Errington, Andrade, Lehman, Pressel, Borders, Olthoff, Behning, Morrison, Hatfield, Morris, Heaton, Manning, Jackson, DeVon, Pierce K, Gore, Klinker, Porter, Hatcher, Harris, Shackleford, Cherry, Steuerwald, Smith V, Greene, Jordan, Baird, Schaibley, Patterson, Culp, Sweet, Bartlett, Pack, Fleming, Garcia Wilburn, Moed, Rowray, Heine, Negele, Pryor, Huston, Summers | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Authored by Representative Hamilton | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Senate sponsor: Senator Qaddoura |