Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 18
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 170: yeas 90, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Representative Cherry added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Pierce M) failed; Roll Call 153: yeas 28, nays 68
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
House sponsor: Representative Wesco
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 60: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #3 (Hunley) failed; Roll Call 39: yeas 9, nays 40
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 38: yeas 9, nays 39
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #4 (Gaskill) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Crane added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Senator Gaskill
|
|
|