Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0135 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 22, 2024
Fiscal Note February 20, 2024
Fiscal Note February 19, 2024
Fiscal Note February 15, 2024
Fiscal Note January 30, 2024
Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Fiscal Note January 22, 2024
Bill January 8, 2024
Fiscal Note January 8, 2024

Engrossed

Bill January 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 22, 2024