Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0135 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/22/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6278	NOTE PREPARED: Feb 22, 2024
BILL NUMBER: SB 135	BILL AMENDED: Jan 29, 2024
SUBJECT: Redistricting Deadline.
FIRST AUTHOR: Sen. Gaskill	BILL STATUS: Enrolled
FIRST SPONSOR: Rep. Wesco
FUNDS AFFECTED: GENERAL	IMPACT: Local
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: The bill requires certain redistricting authorities to redistrict or recertify election
districts before June 30, 2025, if the election district does not have an office on the ballot during the 2024
general election. The bill requires certain redistricting authorities to redistrict or recertify election districts
after January 1, 2025 and before June 30, 2025, if the election district does have an office on the ballot
during the 2024 general election. The bill assesses a penalty if a redistricting authority fails to redistrict or
recertify election districts. The bill makes conforming changes. 
Effective Date:  Upon passage.
Explanation of State Expenditures: 
Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: Summary– There may be a minor temporary reduction in expenditures
for compensation of local redistricting authorities that do not comply with the requirements of the bill.
Additional Information– Affected local units of government would be:
- County commissioners and fiscal bodies
- School corporations with elected governing bodies
- Municipalities
- Township legislative bodies in counties with a consolidated city (Marion County).
An independent study found several county councils outside of the requirements for their districts did not
SB 135	1 redistrict their districts after the 2010 Federal Decennial Census. The same organization that provided the
2010 study has found that about 37 Indiana counties had population deviations exceeding 10% as of January
2022.   
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
State Agencies Affected: 
Local Agencies Affected: Counties, school corporations, municipalities, and townships within a
consolidated city.  
Information Sources: www.indianalocalredistricting.com 
Fiscal Analyst: Chris Baker,  317-232-9851.
SB 135	2