House | 02/06/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Senator Leising added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Senator Baldwin added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Cosponsor: Representative Rowray E | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | House sponsor: Representative Prescott | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 47, nays 1 | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Senator Johnson T added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Authored by Senators Alexander and Rogers |