Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0154 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-*SB0154.1*
2-January 19, 2024
1+
2+Introduced Version
33 SENATE BILL No. 154
44 _____
5-DIGEST OF SB 154 (Updated January 18, 2024 8:08 am - DI 140)
6-Citations Affected: IC 20-27; IC 20-40.
5+DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
6+Citations Affected: IC 20-27-12.1-2; IC 20-40-18-8.
77 Synopsis: Transportation funding. Provides that a school corporation
88 may use the school corporation's operations fund for transportation of
99 school children to certain: (1) apprenticeship programs; (2) career and
1010 technical education programs; (3) modern youth apprenticeships; and
1111 (4) work based learning courses.
1212 Effective: July 1, 2024.
1313 Alexander, Rogers
1414 January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Education and Career
1515 Development.
16-January 18, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass.
17-SB 154—LS 6523/DI 143 January 19, 2024
16+2024 IN 154—LS 6523/DI 143 Introduced
1817 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
1918 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2019 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2120 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2221 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2322 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2423 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2524 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2625 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2726 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
2827 SENATE BILL No. 154
2928 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
3029 education.
3130 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3231 1 SECTION 1. IC 20-27-12.1-2, AS ADDED BY P.L.155-2020,
3332 2 SECTION 11, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3433 3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 2. As used in this chapter, "career and technical
3534 4 education" has the meaning set forth in IC 20-20-38-1. refers to:
3635 5 (1) an apprenticeship program (as defined in IC 20-43-8-0.3);
3736 6 (2) a career and technical education (as defined in
3837 7 IC 20-20-38-1) program;
3938 8 (3) a modern youth apprenticeship (as defined in
4039 9 IC 20-51.4-2-9.5); and
4140 10 (4) a work based learning course (as defined in
4241 11 IC 20-43-8-0.7).
4342 12 SECTION 2. IC 20-40-18-8, AS ADDED BY P.L.244-2017,
4443 13 SECTION 86, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
4544 14 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 8. (a) A school corporation shall use the
4645 15 operations fund to pay the transportation costs attributable to
4746 16 transportation of school children as specified in subsection (b).
4847 17 (b) Only the following costs are payable from the fund:
49-SB 154—LS 6523/DI 143 2
48+2024 IN 154—LS 6523/DI 143 2
5049 1 (1) Salaries paid to bus drivers, transportation supervisors,
5150 2 mechanics and garage employees, clerks, and other transportation
5251 3 related employees.
5352 4 (2) Contracted transportation services.
5453 5 (3) Wages of independent contractors.
5554 6 (4) Contracts with common carriers.
5655 7 (5) Student fares.
5756 8 (6) Transportation related insurance.
5857 9 (7) Transportation of school children to:
5958 10 (A) an apprenticeship program (as defined in
6059 11 IC 20-43-8-0.3);
6160 12 (B) a career and technical education (as defined in
6261 13 IC 20-20-38-1) program;
6362 14 (C) a modern youth apprenticeship (as defined in
6463 15 IC 20-51.4-2-9.5); and
6564 16 (D) a work based learning course (as defined in
6665 17 IC 20-43-8-0.7).
6766 18 (7) (8) Other expenses of operating the school corporation's
6867 19 transportation service, including gasoline, lubricants, tires,
6968 20 repairs, contracted repairs, parts, supplies, equipment, and other
7069 21 related expenses.
7170 22 (c) Percentages or parts of salaries of teaching personnel or
7271 23 principals are not attributable to transportation. However, parts of
7372 24 salaries of instructional aides who are assigned to assist with the school
7473 25 transportation program are attributable to transportation. The costs
7574 26 described in this subsection (other than instructional aide costs) may
7675 27 not be budgeted for payment or paid from the fund.
7776 28 (d) Costs for a calendar year are those costs attributable to
7877 29 transportation for students during the school year ending in the
7978 30 calendar year.
80-SB 154—LS 6523/DI 143 3
81-COMMITTEE REPORT
82-Madam President: The Senate Committee on Education and Career
83-Development, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 154, has had the
84-same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
85-Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS.
86- (Reference is to SB 154 as introduced.)
87-
88-RAATZ, Chairperson
89-Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 2
90-SB 154—LS 6523/DI 143
79+2024 IN 154—LS 6523/DI 143