Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0154 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 01/18/2024

                            *SB0154.1*
January 19, 2024
SENATE BILL No. 154
_____
DIGEST OF SB 154 (Updated January 18, 2024 8:08 am - DI 140)
Citations Affected:  IC 20-27; IC 20-40.
Synopsis:  Transportation funding. Provides that a school corporation
may use the school corporation's operations fund for transportation of
school children to certain: (1) apprenticeship programs; (2) career and
technical education programs; (3) modern youth apprenticeships; and
(4) work based learning courses.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Alexander, Rogers
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Education and Career
Development.
January 18, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass.
SB 154—LS 6523/DI 143  January 19, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 154
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
education.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 20-27-12.1-2, AS ADDED BY P.L.155-2020,
2 SECTION 11, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 2. As used in this chapter, "career and technical
4 education" has the meaning set forth in IC 20-20-38-1. refers to:
5 (1) an apprenticeship program (as defined in IC 20-43-8-0.3);
6 (2) a career and technical education (as defined in
7 IC 20-20-38-1) program;
8 (3) a modern youth apprenticeship (as defined in
9 IC 20-51.4-2-9.5); and
10 (4) a work based learning course (as defined in
11 IC 20-43-8-0.7).
12 SECTION 2. IC 20-40-18-8, AS ADDED BY P.L.244-2017,
13 SECTION 86, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
14 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 8. (a) A school corporation shall use the
15 operations fund to pay the transportation costs attributable to
16 transportation of school children as specified in subsection (b).
17 (b) Only the following costs are payable from the fund:
SB 154—LS 6523/DI 143 2
1 (1) Salaries paid to bus drivers, transportation supervisors,
2 mechanics and garage employees, clerks, and other transportation
3 related employees.
4 (2) Contracted transportation services.
5 (3) Wages of independent contractors.
6 (4) Contracts with common carriers.
7 (5) Student fares.
8 (6) Transportation related insurance.
9 (7) Transportation of school children to:
10 (A) an apprenticeship program (as defined in
11 IC 20-43-8-0.3);
12 (B) a career and technical education (as defined in
13 IC 20-20-38-1) program;
14 (C) a modern youth apprenticeship (as defined in
15 IC 20-51.4-2-9.5); and
16 (D) a work based learning course (as defined in
17 IC 20-43-8-0.7).
18 (7) (8) Other expenses of operating the school corporation's
19 transportation service, including gasoline, lubricants, tires,
20 repairs, contracted repairs, parts, supplies, equipment, and other
21 related expenses.
22 (c) Percentages or parts of salaries of teaching personnel or
23 principals are not attributable to transportation. However, parts of
24 salaries of instructional aides who are assigned to assist with the school
25 transportation program are attributable to transportation. The costs
26 described in this subsection (other than instructional aide costs) may
27 not be budgeted for payment or paid from the fund.
28 (d) Costs for a calendar year are those costs attributable to
29 transportation for students during the school year ending in the
30 calendar year.
SB 154—LS 6523/DI 143 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Education and Career
Development, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 154, has had the
same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS.
 (Reference is to SB 154 as introduced.)
           
RAATZ, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 2
SB 154—LS 6523/DI 143