House | 02/06/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senator Byrne added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | House sponsor: Representative May | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 49: yeas 48, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senator Dernulc added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senator Niemeyer added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Authored by Senator Buck |