Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0156 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Fiscal Note January 23, 2024
Fiscal Note January 19, 2024
Bill January 8, 2024
Fiscal Note January 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 18, 2024