House | 02/16/2024 | Returned to the Senate | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 149: yeas 81, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Representatives Summers, Hamilton, Torr added as cosponsors | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senators Alexander, Alting, Baldwin, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Byrne, Carrasco, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Deery, Dernulc, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Freeman, Garten, Gaskill, Glick, Goode, Holdman, Johnson T, Koch, Leising, Maxwell, Messmer, Mishler, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Pol, Qaddoura, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Tomes, Vinzant, Walker G, Walker K, Yoder, Young M, Zay added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Cosponsor: Representative Harris | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | House sponsor: Representative Porter | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Second reading: adopted voice vote | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Authored by Senators Taylor G and Hunley |