2 | 2 | | SENATE CONCURRENT |
---|
3 | 3 | | RESOLUTION No. 7 |
---|
4 | 4 | | DIGEST OF RESOLUTION |
---|
5 | 5 | | A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department |
---|
6 | 6 | | of Transportation to rename that portion of the I-65N bridge over I-70 |
---|
7 | 7 | | and North College Avenue the "John Leslie 'Wes' Montgomery |
---|
8 | 8 | | Memorial Bridge". |
---|
9 | 9 | | Taylor G, Hunley, Alexander, Alting, |
---|
10 | 10 | | Baldwin, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Bray, |
---|
11 | 11 | | Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, |
---|
12 | 12 | | Byrne, Carrasco, Charbonneau, Crane, |
---|
13 | 13 | | Crider, Deery, Dernulc, Donato, Doriot, |
---|
14 | 14 | | Ford J.D., Freeman, Garten, Gaskill, Glick, |
---|
15 | 15 | | Goode, Holdman, Johnson T, Koch, |
---|
16 | 16 | | Leising, Maxwell, Messmer, Mishler, |
---|
17 | 17 | | Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Pol Jr., Qaddoura, |
---|
18 | 18 | | Raatz, Randolph Lonnie M, Rogers, |
---|
19 | 19 | | Tomes, Vinzant, Walker G, Walker K, |
---|
20 | 20 | | Yoder, Young M, Zay |
---|
21 | 21 | | (HOUSE SPONSORS — PORTER, HARRIS) |
---|
22 | 22 | | January 18, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Homeland Security and |
---|
23 | 23 | | Transportation. |
---|
24 | 24 | | January 23, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass. |
---|
25 | 25 | | January 25, 2024, read second time, adopted by voice vote. |
---|
26 | 26 | | HOUSE ACTION |
---|
27 | 27 | | January 31, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation. |
---|
30 | 29 | | Second Regular Session 123rd General Assembly (2024) |
---|
31 | 30 | | SENATE CONCURRENT |
---|
32 | 31 | | RESOLUTION No. 7 |
---|
33 | 32 | | 1 A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana |
---|
34 | 33 | | 2 Department of Transportation to rename that portion of the |
---|
35 | 34 | | 3 I-65N bridge over I-70 and North College Avenue the "John |
---|
36 | 35 | | 4 Leslie 'Wes' Montgomery Memorial Bridge". |
---|
37 | 36 | | 5 Whereas, John Leslie "Wes" Montgomery was a renowned jazz |
---|
38 | 37 | | 6 musician and Indianapolis native, whose dedication and |
---|
39 | 38 | | 7 achievements in music had a profound influence on the cultural |
---|
40 | 39 | | 8 heritage of Indianapolis; |
---|
41 | 40 | | 9 Whereas, Wes Montgomery was born on March 6, 1923, in |
---|
42 | 41 | | 10 Indianapolis, Indiana, and attended Crispus Attucks High School; |
---|
43 | 42 | | 11 Whereas, Wes Montgomery lived with his wife Serene Miles, at |
---|
44 | 43 | | 12 1217 North Cornell Avenue, under the I-65/I-70 split from 1947 to |
---|
45 | 44 | | 13 1961; |
---|
46 | 45 | | 14 Whereas, Wes Montgomery began playing guitar in his late |
---|
47 | 46 | | 15 teens, bought his first guitar at 19, and was a self-taught musician, |
---|
48 | 47 | | 16 who learned by ear after studying other guitarists of the time; |
---|
49 | 48 | | 17 Whereas, He began his music career in clubs on Indiana |
---|
50 | 49 | | 18 Avenue, Indianapolis' historical Black cultural center, and was |
---|
51 | 50 | | 19 eventually propelled to the national and international stage; |
---|
52 | 51 | | 20 Whereas, Wes Montgomery played with his brothers in Lionel |
---|
53 | 52 | | 21 Hampton's big band from 1948-1950 and as the Montgomery |
---|
54 | 53 | | 22 Brothers from 1960-1961; |
---|
55 | 54 | | 23 Whereas, He developed his own technique for playing and used |
---|
56 | 55 | | 24 his thumb instead of a guitar pick, which resulted in his own unique |
---|
57 | 56 | | 25 sound that had a profound effect on the jazz world and resulted in |
---|
58 | 57 | | SC 7—DC 1900/DI LF 2 |
---|
59 | 58 | | 1 critical acclaim that put his music on the top of Billboard charts, |
---|
60 | 59 | | 2 winning Grammy awards in 1967 and 1970; |
---|
61 | 60 | | 3 Whereas, Wes Montgomery's unique sound that blended |
---|
62 | 61 | | 4 elements of pop and jazz influenced later artists, such as George |
---|
63 | 62 | | 5 Benson; |
---|
64 | 63 | | 6 Whereas, Wes Montgomery passed away in 1968 and is survived |
---|
65 | 64 | | 7 by his family members; and |
---|
66 | 65 | | 8 Whereas, By honoring Wes Montgomery, we acknowledge the |
---|
67 | 66 | | 9 mark he left on jazz music and Indianapolis culture, as well as his |
---|
68 | 67 | | 10 legacy that continues to inspire young musicians: Therefore, |
---|
69 | 68 | | 11 Be it resolved by the Senate of the General Assembly |
---|
70 | 69 | | 12 of the State of Indiana, the House of Representatives |
---|
71 | 70 | | 13 concurring: |
---|
72 | 71 | | 14 SECTION 1. That the Indiana General Assembly urges the |
---|
73 | 72 | | 15 Indiana Department of Transportation to rename that portion of the |
---|
74 | 73 | | 16 I-65N bridge over I-70 and North College Avenue the "John Leslie |
---|
75 | 74 | | 17 'Wes' Montgomery Memorial Bridge". |
---|
76 | 75 | | 18 SECTION 2. That the Secretary of the Senate shall transmit |
---|
77 | 76 | | 19 copies of this resolution to the family of Wes Montgomery and the |
---|
78 | 77 | | 20 Commissioner of the Indiana Department of Transportation. |
---|
79 | 78 | | SC 7—DC 1900/DI LF 3 |
---|
80 | 79 | | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
81 | 80 | | Madam President: The Senate Committee on Homeland Security |
---|
82 | 81 | | and Transportation, to which was referred Senate Concurrent |
---|
83 | 82 | | Resolution No. 7, has had the same under consideration and begs leave |
---|
84 | 83 | | to report the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that |
---|
85 | 84 | | said resolution DO PASS. |
---|
86 | 85 | | (Reference is to SC 7 as introduced.) |
---|
87 | 86 | | |
---|
88 | 87 | | CRIDER, Chairperson |
---|
89 | 88 | | Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0 |
---|