Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SCR0007 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 02/13/2024

                            February 13, 2024
SENATE CONCURRENT
RESOLUTION No. 7
DIGEST OF RESOLUTION
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department
of Transportation to rename that portion of the I-65N bridge over I-70
and North College Avenue the "John Leslie 'Wes' Montgomery
Memorial Bridge". 
Taylor G, Hunley, Alexander, Alting,
Baldwin, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Bray,
Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch,
Byrne, Carrasco, Charbonneau, Crane,
Crider, Deery, Dernulc, Donato, Doriot,
Ford J.D., Freeman, Garten, Gaskill, Glick,
Goode, Holdman, Johnson T, Koch,
Leising, Maxwell, Messmer, Mishler,
Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Pol Jr., Qaddoura,
Raatz, Randolph Lonnie M, Rogers,
Tomes, Vinzant, Walker G, Walker K,
Yoder, Young M, Zay
(HOUSE SPONSORS — PORTER, HARRIS)
January 18, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Homeland Security and
Transportation.
January 23, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass.
January 25, 2024, read second time, adopted by voice vote.
HOUSE ACTION
January 31, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation.
February 13, 2024, reported — Do Pass.
SC 7—DC 1900/DI LF  February 13, 2024
Second Regular Session 123rd General Assembly (2024)
SENATE CONCURRENT
RESOLUTION No. 7
1 A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana
2 Department of Transportation to rename that portion of the
3 I-65N bridge over I-70 and North College Avenue the "John
4 Leslie 'Wes' Montgomery Memorial Bridge". 
5 Whereas, John Leslie "Wes" Montgomery was a renowned jazz
6 musician and Indianapolis native, whose dedication and
7 achievements in music had a profound influence on the cultural
8 heritage of Indianapolis; 
9 Whereas, Wes Montgomery was born on March 6, 1923, in
10 Indianapolis, Indiana, and attended Crispus Attucks High School;
11 Whereas, Wes Montgomery lived with his wife Serene Miles, at
12 1217 North Cornell Avenue, under the I-65/I-70 split from 1947 to
13 1961; 
14 Whereas, Wes Montgomery began playing guitar in his late
15 teens, bought his first guitar at 19, and was a self-taught musician,
16 who learned by ear after studying other guitarists of the time; 
17 Whereas, He began his music career in clubs on Indiana
18 Avenue, Indianapolis' historical Black cultural center, and was
19 eventually propelled to the national and international stage; 
20 Whereas, Wes Montgomery played with his brothers in  Lionel
21 Hampton's big band from 1948-1950 and as the Montgomery
22 Brothers from 1960-1961; 
23 Whereas, He developed his own technique for playing and used
24 his thumb instead of a guitar pick, which resulted in his own unique
25 sound that had a profound effect on the jazz world and resulted in
SC 7—DC 1900/DI LF 2
1 critical acclaim that put his music on the top of Billboard charts,
2 winning Grammy awards in 1967 and 1970; 
3 Whereas, Wes Montgomery's unique sound that blended
4 elements of pop and jazz influenced later artists, such as George
5 Benson; 
6 Whereas, Wes Montgomery passed away in 1968 and is survived
7 by his family members; and 
8 Whereas, By honoring Wes Montgomery, we acknowledge the
9 mark he left on jazz music and Indianapolis culture, as well as his
10 legacy that continues to inspire young musicians: Therefore, 
11 Be it resolved by the Senate of the General Assembly
12 of the State of Indiana, the House of Representatives
13	concurring:
14 SECTION 1. That the Indiana General Assembly urges the
15 Indiana Department of Transportation to rename that portion of the
16 I-65N bridge over I-70 and North College Avenue the "John Leslie
17 'Wes' Montgomery Memorial Bridge".                                             
18     SECTION 2. That the Secretary of the Senate shall transmit
19 copies of this resolution to the family of Wes Montgomery and the
20 Commissioner of the Indiana Department of Transportation. 
SC 7—DC 1900/DI LF 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Homeland Security
and Transportation, to which was referred Senate Concurrent
Resolution No. 7, has had the same under consideration and begs leave
to report the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that
said resolution DO PASS.
 (Reference is to SC 7 as introduced.)
           
CRIDER, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Roads and Transportation, to
which was referred Senate Concurrent Resolution 7, has had the same
under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
House with the recommendation that said resolution do pass. 
(Reference is to SC 7 as printed January 31, 2024.) 
PRESSEL
Committee Vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0         
SC 7—DC 1900/DI LF