Indiana 2025 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1008 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 22, 2025
Fiscal Note April 15, 2025
Fiscal Note April 10, 2025
Fiscal Note April 7, 2025
Fiscal Note February 20, 2025
Fiscal Note February 19, 2025
Fiscal Note February 17, 2025
Bill January 14, 2025
Fiscal Note January 14, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 17, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 7, 2025
Bill February 17, 2025