House | 03/24/2025 | Recommitted to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 126.3 | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Cosponsor: Representative Miller D | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | House sponsor: Representative Haggard | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 57: yeas 49, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | Senator Bassler added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/27/2025 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Authored by Senator Zay |