Indiana 2025 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0310 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/24/2025

                            *ES0310.1*
March 24, 2025
ENGROSSED
SENATE BILL No. 310
_____
DIGEST OF SB 310 (Updated March 24, 2025 2:55 pm - DI 87)
Citations Affected:  Noncode.
Synopsis:  Feasibility study of energy audit of state government
campus. Allows the Indiana department of administration to award a
contract not later than December 31, 2025 for a feasibility study
concerning conducting an energy audit on the: (1) Indiana state capitol
building; and (2) Indiana government center north and south buildings.
Provides that the study's cost must be less than $100,000.
Effective:  July 1, 2025.
Zay, Bassler, Randolph Lonnie M
(HOUSE SPONSORS — HAGGARD, MILLER D)
January 13, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs.
January 27, 2025, reported favorably — Do Pass.
January 30, 2025, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed.
February 3, 2025, read third time, passed. Yeas 49, nays 0.
HOUSE ACTION
March 3, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory
Reform.
March 24, 2025, amended, reported — Do Pass. Referred to Committee on Ways and
Means pursuant to Rule 126.3.
ES 310—LS 6601/DI 119  March 24, 2025
First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
ENGROSSED
SENATE BILL No. 310
A BILL FOR AN ACT concerning utilities.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2025] (a) As used in this
2 SECTION, "Indiana state government campus" means:
3 (1) the Indiana state capitol building located at 200 West
4 Washington Street;
5 (2) the Indiana government center north building located at
6 100 North Senate Avenue; and
7 (3) the Indiana government center south building located at
8 402 West Washington Street;
9 in Indianapolis.
10 (b) Not later than December 31, 2025, the Indiana department
11 of administration may:
12 (1) issue a request for proposals; and
13 (2) award a contract;
14 under IC 5-22-9 for the performance of a feasibility study
15 concerning conducting an energy audit on the buildings of the
16 Indiana state government campus. The cost of the feasibility study
17 must be less than one hundred thousand dollars ($100,000).
ES 310—LS 6601/DI 119 2
1 (c) This SECTION expires January 1, 2026.
ES 310—LS 6601/DI 119 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. President: The Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs, to
which was referred Senate Bill No. 310, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with
the recommendation that said bill DO PASS.
 (Reference is to SB 310 as introduced.)
           
NIEMEYER, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Government and Regulatory
Reform, to which was referred Senate Bill 310, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with
the recommendation that said bill be amended as follows:
Page 1, line 14, delete "for the conduct of an energy audit on the
buildings" and insert "for the performance of a feasibility study
concerning conducting an energy audit on the buildings of the
Indiana state government campus. The cost of the feasibility study
must be less than one hundred thousand dollars ($100,000).".
Page 1, delete line 15.
and when so amended that said bill do pass.
(Reference is to SB 310 as printed January 28, 2025.)
ABBOTT
Committee Vote: yeas 12, nays 0.
ES 310—LS 6601/DI 119