Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | *ES0310.1* | |
2 | - | March 24, 2025 | |
3 | - | ENGROSSED | |
1 | + | *SB0310.1* | |
2 | + | January 28, 2025 | |
4 | 3 | SENATE BILL No. 310 | |
5 | 4 | _____ | |
6 | - | DIGEST OF SB 310 (Updated | |
5 | + | DIGEST OF SB 310 (Updated January 27, 2025 10:45 am - DI 140) | |
7 | 6 | Citations Affected: Noncode. | |
8 | - | Synopsis: Feasibility study of energy audit of state government | |
9 | - | campus. Allows the Indiana department of administration to award a | |
10 | - | contract not later than December 31, 2025 for a feasibility study | |
11 | - | concerning conducting an energy audit on the: (1) Indiana state capitol | |
12 | - | building; and (2) Indiana government center north and south buildings. | |
13 | - | Provides that the study's cost must be less than $100,000. | |
7 | + | Synopsis: Energy audit of state government campus. Provides that the | |
8 | + | Indiana department of administration may issue a request for proposals | |
9 | + | and award a contract for the conduct of an energy audit on the: (1) | |
10 | + | Indiana state capitol building; and (2) Indiana government center north | |
11 | + | and south buildings; not later than December 31, 2025. | |
14 | 12 | Effective: July 1, 2025. | |
15 | - | Zay, Bassler, Randolph Lonnie M | |
16 | - | (HOUSE SPONSORS — HAGGARD, MILLER D) | |
13 | + | Zay | |
17 | 14 | January 13, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs. | |
18 | 15 | January 27, 2025, reported favorably — Do Pass. | |
19 | - | January 30, 2025, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed. | |
20 | - | February 3, 2025, read third time, passed. Yeas 49, nays 0. | |
21 | - | HOUSE ACTION | |
22 | - | March 3, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory | |
23 | - | Reform. | |
24 | - | March 24, 2025, amended, reported — Do Pass. Referred to Committee on Ways and | |
25 | - | Means pursuant to Rule 126.3. | |
26 | - | ES 310—LS 6601/DI 119 March 24, 2025 | |
16 | + | SB 310—LS 6601/DI 119 January 28, 2025 | |
27 | 17 | First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025) | |
28 | 18 | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana | |
29 | 19 | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, | |
30 | 20 | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. | |
31 | 21 | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional | |
32 | 22 | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the | |
33 | 23 | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds | |
34 | 24 | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. | |
35 | 25 | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts | |
36 | 26 | between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly. | |
37 | - | ENGROSSED | |
38 | 27 | SENATE BILL No. 310 | |
39 | 28 | A BILL FOR AN ACT concerning utilities. | |
40 | 29 | Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: | |
41 | 30 | 1 SECTION 1. [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2025] (a) As used in this | |
42 | 31 | 2 SECTION, "Indiana state government campus" means: | |
43 | 32 | 3 (1) the Indiana state capitol building located at 200 West | |
44 | 33 | 4 Washington Street; | |
45 | 34 | 5 (2) the Indiana government center north building located at | |
46 | 35 | 6 100 North Senate Avenue; and | |
47 | 36 | 7 (3) the Indiana government center south building located at | |
48 | 37 | 8 402 West Washington Street; | |
49 | 38 | 9 in Indianapolis. | |
50 | 39 | 10 (b) Not later than December 31, 2025, the Indiana department | |
51 | 40 | 11 of administration may: | |
52 | 41 | 12 (1) issue a request for proposals; and | |
53 | 42 | 13 (2) award a contract; | |
54 | - | 14 under IC 5-22-9 for the performance of a feasibility study | |
55 | - | 15 concerning conducting an energy audit on the buildings of the | |
56 | - | 16 Indiana state government campus. The cost of the feasibility study | |
57 | - | 17 must be less than one hundred thousand dollars ($100,000). | |
58 | - | ES 310—LS 6601/DI 119 2 | |
59 | - | 1 (c) This SECTION expires January 1, 2026. | |
60 | - | ES 310—LS 6601/DI 119 3 | |
43 | + | 14 under IC 5-22-9 for the conduct of an energy audit on the buildings | |
44 | + | 15 of the Indiana state government campus. | |
45 | + | 16 (c) This SECTION expires January 1, 2026. | |
46 | + | SB 310—LS 6601/DI 119 2 | |
61 | 47 | COMMITTEE REPORT | |
62 | 48 | Mr. President: The Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs, to | |
63 | 49 | which was referred Senate Bill No. 310, has had the same under | |
64 | 50 | consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with | |
65 | 51 | the recommendation that said bill DO PASS. | |
66 | 52 | (Reference is to SB 310 as introduced.) | |
67 | 53 | ||
68 | 54 | NIEMEYER, Chairperson | |
69 | 55 | Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0 | |
70 | - | _____ | |
71 | - | COMMITTEE REPORT | |
72 | - | Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Government and Regulatory | |
73 | - | Reform, to which was referred Senate Bill 310, has had the same under | |
74 | - | consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with | |
75 | - | the recommendation that said bill be amended as follows: | |
76 | - | Page 1, line 14, delete "for the conduct of an energy audit on the | |
77 | - | buildings" and insert "for the performance of a feasibility study | |
78 | - | concerning conducting an energy audit on the buildings of the | |
79 | - | Indiana state government campus. The cost of the feasibility study | |
80 | - | must be less than one hundred thousand dollars ($100,000).". | |
81 | - | Page 1, delete line 15. | |
82 | - | and when so amended that said bill do pass. | |
83 | - | (Reference is to SB 310 as printed January 28, 2025.) | |
84 | - | ABBOTT | |
85 | - | Committee Vote: yeas 12, nays 0. | |
86 | - | ES 310—LS 6601/DI 119 | |
56 | + | SB 310—LS 6601/DI 119 |