Indiana 2025 2025 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0310 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/10/2025

                     
Introduced Version
SENATE BILL No. 310
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  Noncode.
Synopsis:  Energy audit of state government campus. Provides that the
Indiana department of administration may issue a request for proposals
and award a contract for the conduct of an energy audit on the: (1)
Indiana state capitol building; and (2) Indiana government center north
and south buildings; not later than December 31, 2025.
Effective:  July 1, 2025.
Zay
January 13, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs.
2025	IN 310—LS 6601/DI 119 Introduced
First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 310
A BILL FOR AN ACT concerning utilities.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2025] (a) As used in this
2 SECTION, "Indiana state government campus" means:
3 (1) the Indiana state capitol building located at 200 West
4 Washington Street;
5 (2) the Indiana government center north building located at
6 100 North Senate Avenue; and
7 (3) the Indiana government center south building located at
8 402 West Washington Street;
9 in Indianapolis.
10 (b) Not later than December 31, 2025, the Indiana department
11 of administration may:
12 (1) issue a request for proposals; and
13 (2) award a contract;
14 under IC 5-22-9 for the conduct of an energy audit on the buildings
15 of the Indiana state government campus.
16 (c) This SECTION expires January 1, 2026.
2025	IN 310—LS 6601/DI 119