Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Died in Senate Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Engrossed on Monday, February 26, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Williams, K. was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Williams, K.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, January 17, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 218-N
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
House Introduced
|
|
|