Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 118 Nay: 5
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Sutton, Representative Penn and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Fagg and Senator Holscher as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 109 Nay: 11
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House Hearing: Monday, March 4, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 31, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|