Kansas 2025-2026 Regular Session

Kansas Senate Bill SB42 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 28, 2025
Bill January 21, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 10, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 27, 2025
Analysis March 7, 2025
Analysis February 19, 2025
Analysis February 17, 2025

Amended

Bill
Bill
Bill