|
06/30/2010
|
Effective date: May 1, 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 814.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2010
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Amedee, Riser, and Kostelka.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
House conferees appointed: Smiley, Gallot, and Pope.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Notice House rejected Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on April 27, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Reported with amendments (18-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|