06/21/2010 | Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/21/2010. | |||
06/21/2010 | Approved on 6/21/10. | |||
06/17/2010 | Study request list distributed to the members on 6/17/10. | |||
06/17/2010 | Request study by the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |||
06/17/2010 | Received by the Senate Office on 6/17/10. | |||
06/17/2010 | Sent to the Senate. | |||
06/15/2010 | Study request list distributed to members on 6/15/2010. | |||
06/14/2010 | Received on 6/14/2010. |