LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB479
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB479
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB479
Action History
06/07/2010
Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate.
06/07/2010
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
04/19/2010
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
04/15/2010
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
04/14/2010
Reported with amendments.
03/29/2010
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Insurance.
03/19/2010
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Insurance.