|
05/21/2012
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/17/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|