05/21/2012 | By a vote of 24 yeas and 12 nays. | |||
05/21/2012 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | |||
05/21/2012 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | |||
05/21/2012 | Called from the Calendar. | |||
05/07/2012 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
05/02/2012 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |||
05/01/2012 | Reported with amendments. | |||
04/03/2012 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |