House
|
06/12/2014
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 82, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2014
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|