Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 87 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2014
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|