Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB400

Introduced
3/30/23  
Refer
3/30/23  
Refer
3/30/23  
Refer
4/10/23  
Refer
5/10/23  
Refer
5/10/23  
Refer
5/11/23  
Refer
5/11/23  
Report Pass
5/16/23  

Caption

(Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to the membership of the Louisiana State University and Southern University boards of supervisors

Impact

The amendment affects Article VIII, Section 7(B)(1) of the Louisiana Constitution, which currently dictates the structure and appointment procedures for the boards. If passed, this measure would ensure that the boards not only consist of individuals appointed by the governor but also incorporate the experiences and insights of alumni, thereby potentially improving decision-making related to student affairs, alumni relations, and institutional priorities.

Summary

House Bill 400 is a proposed constitutional amendment seeking to modify the composition of the boards of supervisors for Louisiana State University and Southern University. Specifically, the bill mandates that each board must include at least one member who is an alumnus from each institution under its jurisdiction. This change aims to enhance representation and ensure that alumni perspectives are included in the governance processes of these educational institutions.

Sentiment

The sentiment around HB 400 appears to be generally positive among proponents, who argue that including alumni in governance will lead to more informed decisions that reflect the needs of the student body and alumni community. Critics, however, may question whether this change is necessary or if it complicates the current governance structure, expressing concerns about the potential politicization of board appointments.

Contention

Notably, the bill's passage reflects broader discussions about governance in public higher education, particularly the balance between state control and local representation. Debate may arise over how effectively alumni can represent their institutions and whether such requirements could impede the governor's ability to appoint qualified individuals based on merit alone. Ultimately, voters will decide the outcome of this amendment in the statewide election set for October 14, 2023.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA HB798

Appropriates funds for payment of certain judgments against the DOTD

LA HB351

Designates the song "Southern Nights" by Allen Toussaint as the official state cultural song

LA HB537

Provides for the transfer of UNO from the LSU System to the UL System and specifies goals for the postsecondary education delivery system for the New Orleans region (REF INCREASE GF EX See Note)

LA SR86

Designates May 15, 2023, as Southern University Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA HR153

Designates May 15, 2023, as Southern University Day at the state capitol

LA HR172

Recognizes Monday, June 5, 2017, as Southern University Day at the state capitol

LA HR43

Recognizes Thursday, March 27, 2014, as Southern Poverty Law Center Day at the state capitol

LA HR47

Recognizes March 28, 2018, as Southern University Day at the state capitol