House
|
05/31/2023
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 51, nays 49. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported with amendments (9-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported favorably (8-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|